EP1198508 - PREPARATIONS CONTAINING NO CROSS-LINKING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Gisbert Annaweg 10 D-89165 Dietenheim / DE | 02 /
HOLZER, Josef Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 8 D-89257 Illertissen / DE | 03 /
SANDER, Andreas Karlsbader Strasse 19 D-89257 Illertissen / DE | 04 /
HEILEMANN, Andrea Mahdanweg 1 D-89171 Illerkirchberg / DE | [2002/17] | Application number, filing date | 00943964.7 | 01.07.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000EP06162 | Priority number, date | DE1999132075 | 12.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932075 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0104207 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198508 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198508 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L5/08, C08B37/08, A61K7/00, A61K47/36, A61K31/722, A23L1/056, A61L15/28 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
A23L29/275 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A61K8/736 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61Q1/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/003 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Title | German: | VERNETZERFREIE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [2002/17] | English: | PREPARATIONS CONTAINING NO CROSS-LINKING AGENTS | [2002/17] | French: | PREPARATIONS EXEMPTES D'AGENT DE RETICULATION | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.03.2005 | IE | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | AT | 01.07.2005 | CY | 01.07.2005 | LU | 01.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | CH | 31.07.2005 | LI | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/26] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 01.07.2005 | ||
CY | 01.07.2005 | ||
LU | 01.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 01.07.2005 | ||
CY | 01.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 01.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 01.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6462302 ; | JPS6462302 [ ]; | [X]JPS6317901 ; | JPS6390507 [ ] (UNITIKA LTD); | [X]US4833237 (KAWAMURA YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * examples 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [X] - "WATER SOLUBLE CHITOSAN SALT USED FOR ÜPACKING COSMETICS, ETC...-PREPD BY NEUTRALISING ACIDIC AQ. SOLN. OF CHITOSAN WITH CARBONATE", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 16, Database accession no. 1989-117701, XP002151163 & JPS6462302 A 19890308 (NIPPON SUISAN KAISHA LTD) [X] 1-3,9-11,15,17,18 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890615), vol. 013, no. 260, Database accession no. (C - 607), & JP01062302 A 19890308 (NIPPON SUISAN KAISHA LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - "MANUFACTURE OF WATER-SOLUBLE CHITOSAN SALTS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890828), vol. 111, no. 9, Database accession no. 78544 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - "CHITOSAN SPONGES AS SURGICAL DRESSINGS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890710), vol. 111, no. 2, Database accession no. 12542, XP002151162 [X] 1-4,12,14,16 * abstract * | [X] - "PURIFICN. OF CHITOSAN - BY ADJUSTING PH OF SOLN. CONTG. CHITOSAN, TO ABOUT 6, TO FORM DEPOSIT WHICH IS OPT. WASHED WITH WATER AND DISSOLVED IN ACID", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 09, Database accession no. 1988-061314, XP002151164 & JPS6317901 A 19880125 (HIGETA SHOYU KK) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,11 * abstract * | [ ] - "PURIFICATION OF CHITOSAN", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880530), vol. 108, no. 22, Database accession no. 188789 [ ] * abstract * |