EP1197075 - INTERACTIVE TELEVISION PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH NICHE HUBS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 7140 South Lewis Avenue Tulsa, OK 74136 / US | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Michael, D. 1300 Kingwood Place Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 02 /
KNUDSON, Edward, B. 11055 West Rowland Avenue Littleton, CO 80127 / US | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00944897.8 | 27.06.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000US17590 | Priority number, date | US19990141501P | 28.06.1999 Original published format: US 141501 P | US20000604470 | 26.06.2000 Original published format: US 604470 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101677 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197075 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/173 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N21/485 (US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/466 (EP,US);
H04N21/4667 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4753 (US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/4786 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (US);
H04N21/4826 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERAKTIVES FERNSEHPROGRAMMZEITSCHRIFTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT KATEGORIEUNTERMENÜ | [2002/16] | English: | INTERACTIVE TELEVISION PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH NICHE HUBS | [2002/16] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GUIDE INTERACTIF DE PROGRAMMES DE TELEVISION A PLAQUES TOURNANTE DE NICHES | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/52] | 17.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5621456 (FLORIN FABRICE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,53,54,80,82,108,109,117,122,130,131,133 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 8 * * column 18, line 10 - column 20, line 31 * * column 22, line 65 - column 24, line 57 * * figures 22-32,36,39-41 * [Y] 3-5,7-10,12,20-22,29,30,36,43,45,57,59,60,62,70,81,83,85-87,89-92,98-100,115,124,129,137,139,140,142; | [YA]US5694176 (BRUETTE JEFF [US], et al) [Y] 22,29,30,43,91,100 * column 2, line 2 - line 38 * * column 4, line 35 - line 51 * * column 5, line 31 - line 42 * * figure 3A * [A] 1,53,80,133; | [Y]WO9826584 (PREVUE INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [Y] 5,45,57,83,92,124,129,137 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 6 * * page 17, line 14 - line 23 ** page 21, line 8 - line 21 *; | [YA]US5822123 (DAVIS BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,7,10,21,36,59,81,85,89,99,115,139 * column 4, line 64 - line 66 * * column 12, line 24 - line 41 * * column 13, line 17 - line 52 * * column 18, line 63 - column 19, line 9 * * column 21, line 66 - column 26, line 19 * * figures 7,19,23,27,38A * [A] 1,53,80,133; | [Y]WO9914947 (PREVUE INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [Y] 8,9,12,20,60,62,70,86,87,90,98,140,142 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 2 * * page 10, line 20 - line 23 * * page 21, line 6 - page 22, line 19 * * figure 1 * |