EP1196400 - AMINO-ALKYL DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED Andrew S. Marks, 130 Waverley Street Cambridge, MA 01239-4242 / US | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARBESON, Scott 203 Pemberton Street, 5 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 02 /
MULLICAN, Michael 110 Parker Road Needham, MA 02194 / US | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/16] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00945160.0 | 05.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000US18430 | Priority number, date | US19990142510P | 06.07.1999 Original published format: US 142510 P | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0102376 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196400 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/28, C07D207/09, C07D211/32, C07C225/06, C07C233/36, C07C233/78, C07C271/20, C07D213/38, A61K31/40, A61K31/43, A61K31/44, A61K31/435, A61K31/13, A61P25/28 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C225/06 (EP,US);
C07C233/36 (EP,US);
C07C233/78 (EP,US);
C07C271/20 (EP,US);
C07D207/09 (EP,US);
C07D211/32 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D277/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINO-ALKYL VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/16] | English: | AMINO-ALKYL DERIVATIVES | [2002/16] | French: | DERIVES ALKYLAMINO | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/31] | 24.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9640633 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [AD] 1,12,16* page 5, line 12 - page 13, line 13 *; | [AD]WO9716190 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [AD] 1,12,16 * page 19 - page 23 *; | [X] - DUBEY S. K., SATYAVAN SHARMA, IYER R. N., "An Unusual N-Dealkylation-Neighbouring Group Participations of Oximino Function", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR NATURFORSCHUNG; TEIL B - ANORGANISCHE, ORGANISCHE CHEMIE, (197910), vol. 34b, no. 10, pages 1424 - 1426, XP000960708 [X] 1 * the whole document * |