EP1197035 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURELY TRANSMITTING DISTRIBUTED CHALLENGE VALUES (RAND) FOR USE IN MOBILE STATION AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/16] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURELY TRANSMITTING DISTRIBUTED RAND SIGNALS FOR USE IN MOBILE STATION AUTHENTICATION | ||
[2005/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2006/13] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, Gregory, G. 6 Kingston Avenue Mortlake, NSW 2137 / AU | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Milhench, Howard Leslie R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00945266.5 | 07.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000US18687 | Priority number, date | US19990350213 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: US 350213 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105091 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197035 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197035 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04Q7/38 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/0625 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/32 (KR);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (KR);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHEREN ÜBERTRAGUNG VERTEILTER AUTHENTISIERUNGSABFRAGEWERTE (RAND) ZUR ANWENDUNG BEI DER AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINER MOBILSTATION | [2005/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURELY TRANSMITTING DISTRIBUTED CHALLENGE VALUES (RAND) FOR USE IN MOBILE STATION AUTHENTICATION | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A EMETTRE DE MANIERE SURE DES SIGNAUX DISTRIBUES DE VALEUR DE DEFI (RAND) A USAGE D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE STATION MOBILE | [2005/37] |
Former [2002/16] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHEREN ÜBERTRAGUNG VERTEILTER RANDSIGNALE ZUR ANWEDUNG BEI DER AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINER MOBILSTATION | ||
Former [2002/16] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURELY TRANSMITTING DISTRIBUTED RAND SIGNALS FOR USE IN MOBILE STATION AUTHENTICATION | ||
Former [2002/16] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A EMETTRE DE MANIERE SURE DES SIGNAUX DISTRIBUES DE VALEUR DE DEFI A USAGE D'AUTHENTIFICATION DE STATION MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 29.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0768775 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12,23,35 * column 2, line 22 - line 31 ** column 8, line 47 - line 58 *; | [A]EP0872976 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [A] 1,12,23,35 * column 3, line 32 - line 42 * * column 9, line 5 - line 58 * |