EP1181368 - MUTEINS OF BILIN-BINDING PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pieris Proteolab AG Blumenstrasse 16 85354 Freising-Weihenstephan / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Pieris Proteolab AG Blumenstrasse 16 85354 Freising / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKERRA, Arne Max-Lehner-Str. 18 D-85354 Freising / DE | 02 /
SCHLEHUBER, Steffen Murstr. 21 D-85356 Freising / DE | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00945617.9 | 08.06.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000DE01873 | Priority number, date | DE1999126068 | 08.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926068 | [2002/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075308 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181368 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/435, C12N15/62 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/43563 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Title | German: | MUTEINE DES BILIN-BINDUNGSPROTEINS | [2002/09] | English: | MUTEINS OF BILIN-BINDING PROTEIN | [2002/09] | French: | MUTEINES DE LA PROTEINE LIANT LA BILINE | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/52] | 23.11.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2006 | 23.11.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9916873 (SKERRA ARNE [DE], et al) [A] * pages 5-15,39, claims *; | [A]WO8906698 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] * example 21 *; | [A]EP0835934 (INST BIOANALYTIK GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - BESTE GERALD ET AL, "Small antibody-like proteins with prescribed ligand specificities derived from the lipocalin fold.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, March 2, 1999, (19990302), vol. 96, no. 5, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1898 - 1903, XP002150337 [A] * page 1903, left column; fourth paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.5.1898 | [A] - FLOWER D, "The lipocalin protein family: structure and function", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL,GB,PORTLAND PRESS, LONDON, (1996), vol. 318, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 1 - 14, XP002095126 [A] * page 6 , left column; Fig. 4e); Table 2; * | [DA] - SCHMIDT FRANK S ET AL, "The bilin-binding protein of Pieris brassicae cDNA sequence and regulation of expression reveal distinct features of this insect pigment protein.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 219, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 855 - 863, XP002095123 [DA] * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1994.tb18567.x | [PX] - SCHLEHUBER STEFFEN ET AL, "A novel type of receptor protein, based on the lipocalin scaffold, with specificity for digoxigenin.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (20000414), vol. 297, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 1105 - 1120, XP002150338 [PX] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.3646 |