EP1196589 - CLONING OF BASB110 ANTIGEN FROM MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | ||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS (S.A.), formerly SMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS (S.A.) Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thonnard, Joelle SmithKline Beecham Bio. S.A. Rue de L'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00945812.6 | 23.06.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000EP05854 | Priority number, date | GB19990015031 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9915031 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100838 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196589 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/21, A61K39/02, C07K16/12, G01N33/53, C12N15/62 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/212 (EP);
A61K2039/57 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLONIERUNG DES MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS ANTIGENS BASB110 | [2002/16] | English: | CLONING OF BASB110 ANTIGEN FROM MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS | [2002/16] | French: | CLONAGE DE L'ANTIGENE BASB110 DE MORAXELLA (BRANHAMELLA) CATARRHALIS | [2002/16] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/52] | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9741731 (ANTEX BIOLOG INC) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9634960 (LOOSMORE SHEENA M ;CONNAUGHT LAB (CA); CHONG PELE (CA); KLEIN MICH) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9806851 (AEBI CHRISTOPH ;COPE LESLIE D (US); HANSEN ERIC J (US); UNIV TEXAS) [A] * the whole document * |