EP1204126 - NIOBIUM POWDER, ITS SINTERED BODY, AND CAPACITOR COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shibadaimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9, Shibadaimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAITO, Kazumi Central Research Laboratory Showa Denko K.K. 1-1, Ohnodai 1-chome Midori-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/19] | Application number, filing date | 00946343.1 | 14.07.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000JP04753 | Priority number, date | JP19990201058 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20105899 | [2002/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0106525 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204126 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204126 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/042, B22F1/00, C22C27/02, C22C1/04, C22C32/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H01G9/0525 (EP);
B22F1/00 (KR);
C22C1/045 (EP);
C22C27/02 (EP);
C22C32/0068 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/19] | H01G9/042, B22F1/00, C22C27/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIOB PULVER, GESINTERTER KÖRPER UND DARAUS BESTEHENDER KONDENSATOR | [2002/19] | English: | NIOBIUM POWDER, ITS SINTERED BODY, AND CAPACITOR COMPRISING THE SAME | [2002/19] | French: | POUDRE DE NIOBIUM, CORPS FRITTE A BASE DE CETTE POUDRE, ET CONDENSATEUR COMPRENANT CE CORPS | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2002 | Translation filed | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2005 | BE | 14.09.2005 | CH | 14.09.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | IT | 14.09.2005 | LI | 14.09.2005 | NL | 14.09.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | SE | 14.12.2005 | ES | 25.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IT | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
SE | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH01167206 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JPH10242004 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [Y]JPH11145008 (NEC CORP); | [XP]JPH11329902 (NEC CORP) |