|
17.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
32 |
|
02.11.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2012 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
34 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.06.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
21 |
|
08.06.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
64 |
|
03.11.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
22.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
72 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2002 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.11.2001 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
30.11.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.01.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
63 |