EP1202254 - READ/WRITE HEAD AND MAGNETIC RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI MAXELL, LTD. 1-88, Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states HITACHI MAXELL, LTD. 1-88, Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8567 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKABAYASHI, Kouichirou 204, 34-3, Togashira 3-chome Toride-shi, Ibaraki 302-0034 / JP | 02 /
TAKEUCHI, Teruaki 2-7, Kubogaoka 4-chome, Moriyamachi Kitasouma-gun, Ibaraki 302-0104 / JP | 03 /
INABA, Nobuyuki 14, Minumacho 3-chome Hasuda-shi, Saitama 349-0127 / JP | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Wiebusch, Manfred Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Wiebusch, Manfred Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | Wiebusch, Manfred TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00946403.3 | 19.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000JP04842 | Priority number, date | JP19990206453 | 21.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20645399 | [2002/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0106498 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1202254 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/02, G11B11/105, G11B11/10, G11B5/00, G11B5/012, G11B5/127, G11B5/48, G11B5/596 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
G11B5/127 (EP,US);
G11B5/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/012 (EP,US);
G11B5/4886 (EP,US);
G11B5/59683 (EP,US);
G11B13/045 (EP,US);
G11B2005/0002 (EP,US);
G11B2005/0005 (EP,US);
G11B2005/0021 (EP,US);
G11B5/3103 (EP,US);
G11B5/3967 (EP,US);
G11B5/596 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | G11B5/02, G11B11/105, G11B11/10 | Designated contracting states | NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LESE- SCHREIBKOPF UND MAGNETAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/18] | English: | READ/WRITE HEAD AND MAGNETIC RECORDING DEVICE | [2002/18] | French: | TETE DE LECTURE/ECRITURE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2002 | Translation filed | 08.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19843713 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5889641 (BELSER KARL A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,10,13 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH03189905 ; | [A]US5353268 (HINTZ MICHAEL B [US]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [PA]WO9953482 (SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY [US]) [PA] 1 * figure 4g * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911115), vol. 015, no. 451, Database accession no. (P - 1276), & JP03189905 A 19910819 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,3,6,7,10,13 * abstract * * figure - * | International search | [Y]JPH07110920 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH08339514 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH08221918 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH03189915 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH04176034 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPH06243527 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US5523898 (JOVE STEPHEN A [US], et al) |