EP1197023 - A TUNEABLE OPTICAL FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGUSTSSON, Torsten Jaktvägen 48 S-194 66 Upplands Väsby / SE | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Norin, Klas Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Kista 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/16] | Hedberg, Sten Torsten, et al Ericsson Microelectronics AB, Department for IPR 164 81 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00946645.9 | 26.06.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000SE01351 | Priority number, date | SE19990002513 | 01.07.1999 Original published format: SE 9902513 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103351 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197023 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04Q11/00 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0003 (EP,US);
G02B5/20 (KR,US);
H04B10/675 (EP,US);
H04J14/0206 (EP,US);
H04J14/0209 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTIMMBARER OPTISCHER FILTER | [2002/16] | English: | A TUNEABLE OPTICAL FILTER | [2002/16] | French: | FILTRE OPTIQUE A ACCORD | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/27] | 25.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4337089 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0699927 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [A]US5612805 (FEVRIER HERVE [FR], et al); | [A]US5712717 (HAMEL ANDRE [FR], et al); | [A]WO9914879 (CORNING INC [US], et al); |