EP1196399 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SUBSTITUTED BENZISOTHIAZOLE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEFFERNAN, Gavin, David 616 East 6th Street Florence, NJ 08518 / US | [2002/16] | Application number, filing date | 00947164.0 | 10.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000US18767 | Priority number, date | US19990354697 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: US 354697 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105775 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196399 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D275/04, C07D417/04, C07D417/14, // A01N43:80 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
C07D275/04 (EP,US);
C07D275/00 (KR);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTITUIERTEN BENZISOTHIAZOLVERBINDUNGEN | [2002/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF SUBSTITUTED BENZISOTHIAZOLE COMPOUNDS | [2002/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES BENZISOTHIAZOLE SUBSTITUES | [2002/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 26.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE217688 (FARBENFABRIKEN VORM. FIEDR. BAYER & CO.) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5484763 (WEPPLO PETER J [US]) [DY] 1-15 * the whole document, particularly columns 37, 38, and examples 21, 23, 25 and 28 *; | [Y] - CROSSFIRE, Beilstein Institut zur Foerderung der chemischen Wissenschaften, XP002148646 [Y] 1-15 * Reaction ID 408215 (Reaction Details 3 of 3), 1147301 and 1147204 * | [ ] - INDIAN J. CHEM. SECT. B, (1976), vol. 14, pages 625 - 626 | [DA] - CLARKE K ET AL, "Condensed isothiazoles. Part 6. Compounds of potential biological interest obtained from 3-methyl- 1,2-benzisothiazole and its 5-substituted derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19800526), vol. 92, no. 21, Database accession no. 181070r, page 645, XP002148645 [DA] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - J. CHEM. RES., SYNOP., (1979), no. 12, page 395 | [DA] - VITALI T ET AL, "Condensation of o-thiocyanatoacetophenone with hydroxylamine. Properties and X-ray crystal structure analysis of (Z)-2-hydroxyimino-4-methyl- 2H-1,3-benzo[e]thiazine", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PEKIN TRANSACTIONS II, (1977), no. 9, pages 1114 - 1117, XP002148644 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p29770001114 |