EP1216102 - CENTRIFUGAL FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analytical Engineering, Inc. 2555 Technology Blvd., P.O. Box 2603 Columbus, IN 47201 / US | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAY, David, F. 2422 Cedar Crest Drive Columbus, IN 47203 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00947200.2 | 11.07.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000US18838 | Priority number, date | US19990352294 | 12.07.1999 Original published format: US 352294 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103846 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216102 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/00, B04B9/04, B04B9/06, B04B9/08, B04B11/02 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
B04B11/02 (EP,US);
B04B5/005 (EP,US);
B04B9/04 (EP,US);
B04B9/06 (EP,US);
B04B9/08 (EP,US);
F01M2013/0422 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/26] | B04B9/02, B04B9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/26] | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALFILTER | [2002/26] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL FILTER | [2002/26] | French: | FILTRE CENTRIFUGE | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2002 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4891041 (HOHMANN EUGEN [DE], et al) [Y] 34 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 40 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,13; | [YA]US4492631 (MARTIN H WOODS [US]) [Y] 34 * figure 4 * [A] 1,13; | [Y]JPH08266932 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 34 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5494579 (ROBATEL MICHEL [FR], et al); | [X]US5364335 (FRANZEN PAUL H [US], et al); | [X]US4891041 (HOHMANN EUGEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2129992 (DE MATTIA ANTHONY); | [Y]US3403848 (WINDSOR MEREDITH M, et al); | [X]US2647686 (DRURY HERBERT R); | [A]US2745217 (LUCIUS GOLD RICHARD, et al); | [A]US3007629 (ARTHUR BOYLAND DONALD); | [A]US4106689 (KOZULLA ROBERT E); | [X]US5656164 (VADO GIOVANNI ANTONIO [IT], et al) |