EP1199943 - FOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2005/01] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever Plc Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2003/01] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever Plc Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2002/18] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
Unilever Plc Unilever House, Blackfriars London, Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daniels, Stephen C. Un.Deut. LebensmittelwerkGmbH Oberstdorfer Strasse 7 D-87435 Kempten / DE | 02 /
Norton, Ian Timothy Unilever Research Colworth Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | 03 /
Pelan, Edward G. Unilever Research Vlaardingen Olivier Van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 04 /
Williams, Andrea Unilever Research Colworth Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2005/01] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2002/18] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al Unilever N.V., Patent Department, Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 00947921.3 | 03.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000EP06237 | Priority number, date | EP19990306185 | 04.08.1999 Original published format: EP 99306185 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110234 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199943 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199943 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23D7/00, A23D7/05 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
A23D7/05 (EP,US);
A23D7/001 (EP,US);
A23D7/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [2002/18] | English: | FOOD PRODUCT | [2002/18] | French: | PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | CH | 15.12.2004 | IT | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.03.2005 | ES | 26.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | CY | 03.07.2005 | LU | 03.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
IT | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
CY | 03.07.2005 | ||
LU | 03.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
CY | 03.07.2005 | ||
LU | 03.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
CY | 03.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
ES | 26.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
LI | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0422714 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8,15 * page 2, lines 3-6 * * page 2, lines 42-52 * * page 3, lines 6-15 * * page 3, lines 28-30 *; | [A]EP0445849 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3, lines 41-49 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1,7,8 *; | [A]EP0463688 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-4,7-14 * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 13 * * page 4, lines 38-49 * * page 5, lines 3-7 * * page 5, lines 33-46 * * examples 1,5 * * claims 1,4,7,8,12 *; | [A] - MATSUMURA, Y., OKAMURA, E., HIDAKA, H., MIYABE, M., AND MORI, T., "Effect of carnauba wax on physical states of palm kernel oil-in-water emulsions.", BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 59, no. 9, pages 1688 - 1693, XP002127161 [A] 1-4,8-10 * page 1691, column 2, lines 3-6 * * page 1688, column 2, paragraph 4 * * Discussion * |