EP1206495 - CHIMERIC POLYPEPTIDES, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4070 Basel / CH | [2007/07] |
Former [2002/21] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LILIE, Hauke Bruckdorfer Strasse 4 D-06120 Halle / DE | 02 /
RICHTER, Susanne Herderstrasse 13 D-06114 Halle / DE | 03 /
RUDOLPH, Rainer Dr.-Hans-Litten-Strasse 28 D-06120 Halle / DE | 04 /
STUBENRAUCH, Kay-Gunnar Rapotostrasse 6 D-80687 München / DE | [2002/27] |
Former [2002/21] | 01 /
LILIE, Hauke Bruckdorfer Strasse 4 D-06120 Halle / DE | ||
02 /
RICHTER, Susanne Herderstrasse 13 D-06114 Halle / DE | |||
03 /
RUDOLPH, Rainer Körnerstrasse 37 D-06114 Halle / DE | |||
04 /
STUBENRAUCH, Kay-Gunnar Rapotostrasse 6 D-80687 München / DE | Representative(s) | Schreiner, Siegfried Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (TR-E) Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2002/21] | Schreiner, Siegfried, Dr. Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Patent Department Pharma (TR-E), P.O. Box 1152 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00948017.9 | 31.07.2000 | [2002/21] | WO2000EP07378 | Priority number, date | EP19990115022 | 02.08.1999 Original published format: EP 99115022 | [2002/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0109193 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1206495 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1206495 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07K19/00, C07K16/46, C07K7/06, C12P21/02, C07K14/025, C07K16/00, C07K16/40, C12N9/34 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (KR);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/624 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/22022 (EP,US);
C12N2710/22023 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/21] | C07K19/00, C07K16/46, C07K7/06, C12P21/02, // (C07K14/025, 16:00, 16:40, C12N9:34) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE POLYPEPTIDE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2002/21] | English: | CHIMERIC POLYPEPTIDES, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USES THEREOF | [2002/21] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES CHIMERIQUES, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATIONS | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 20.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | SE | 14.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | LU | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 14.02.2007 | |
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 14.02.2007 | |
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 14.02.2007 | |
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 14.02.2007 | |
SE | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 14.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9429350 (US HEALTH [US]); | [A]WO9850431 (GENENTECH INC [US]); |