EP1210337 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 4,6-DICHLOROPYRIMIDINE WITH SULFUR COMPOUNDS AND PHOSPHOROUS COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2004/01] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIS, Franz-Josef Otto-Hahn-Str. 164 D-40591 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KLAUSENER, Alexander Schiffgesweg 18 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | 03 /
CRAMM, Günther Ottweilerstr. 10 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
STEFFAN, Guido Im Herzogenfeld 52 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | [2002/27] |
Former [2002/23] | 01 /
MAIS, Franz-Josef Otto-Hahn-Str. 164 D-40591 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
KLAUSENER, Alexander Schiffgesweg 18 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | |||
03 /
CRAMM, Günther Am Sonnenhang 38 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | |||
04 /
STEFFAN, Guido Im Herzogenfeld 52 D-51519 Odenthal / DE | Application number, filing date | 00948019.5 | 31.07.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000EP07401 | Priority number, date | DE1999138500 | 13.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19938500 | [2002/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112610 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210337 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/30 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
C07D239/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 4,6-DICHLORPYRIMIDIN MIT SCHWEFEL- UND PHOSPHORVERBINDUNGEN | [2002/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING 4,6-DICHLOROPYRIMIDINE WITH SULFUR COMPOUNDS AND PHOSPHOROUS COMPOUNDS | [2002/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 4,6-DICHLOROPYRIMIDINE AVEC DES COMPOSES SOUFRE ET PHOSPHORE | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0745593 (CHEMIE LINZ GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9529166 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DY] - "CHLORINATION OF PYRIMIDINES", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,GB,INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT, (19961101), no. 391, ISSN 0374-4353, pages 690 - 691, XP000680903 [DY] 1-8 * example 2 * | [Y] - SHIAO MIN-JEN, "A convenient synthesis of halogenated 2-chloropyridines by transfor- mation of halogenated 2-methoxypyridines under Vilsmeier-Haack conditions", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS., MARCEL DEKKER, INC., BASEL., CH, (1990), vol. 20, no. 19, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 2971 - 2977, XP000960608 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919008051514 |