EP1208548 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO SECURITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomotix Limited Enterprise House, Vision Park Histon Cambridge CB4 9ZR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Biomotix Limited Enterprise House, Vision Park Histon, Cambridge CB4 9ZR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEART, Pilgrim Russell House, Chippenham Park Chippenham CB7 5PT / GB | 02 /
BEART, Jason, Highfield Farm House 11 Apthorpe Street, Fulbourn Cambridge CB1 5EY / GB | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00948160.7 | 26.07.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000GB02880 | Priority number, date | GB19990017490 | 27.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9917490 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0108116 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1208548 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/00 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
G08B25/008 (EP);
G08B13/1427 (EP);
G08B21/0227 (EP);
G08B21/0258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IN BEZIEHUNG AUF SICHERHEITEINRICHTUNGEN | [2002/22] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO SECURITY | [2002/22] | French: | AMELIORATIONS SE RAPPORTANT A LA SECURITE | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5661460 (SALLEN ROY ET AL) [X] 1-16,30,33,35,58,59,61,70,71,79-82,84,86-90 * column 1, line 17 - line 23 * * column 1, line 49 - line 67 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 60 - line 62 * * column 5, line 59 - line 67 * * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 10 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 25 * [A] 29; | [X]FR2768249 (FEINGOLD RALPH) [X] 1,2,4,5,70,71,79,81,82,86,88-90,92,93 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 15 * * page 3, line 10 - line 21 *; | [A]EP0840265 (E LEAD ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1,70,93 * the whole document * | Examination | US5583486 |