EP1203491 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MULTIMEDIA MESSAGING IN A CABLE OR SATELLITE SUBSCRIBER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2016/16] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Scientific Atlanta, Inc. Intellectual Property Department (ATL 4.3.), 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, Georgia 30044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JERDING, Dean, F. 315 Seventeenth Fwy. Roswell, GA 30076 / US | 02 /
BANKER, Robert, O. 1581 Chamblee Gap Road Cumming, GA 30040 / US | 03 /
MANSON, Azita, M. 6465 Stapleford Lane Duluth, GA 30097 / US | 04 /
ADDINGTON, Timothy, H. 4332 Stonehaven Trace Roswell, GA 30075 / US | 05 /
RODRIGUEZ, Arturo, A. 5315 Abigail Lane Norcross, GA 30092 / US | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2010/33] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/19] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole, et al Novapat International S.A. 25 avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets, Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 00948701.8 | 14.07.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000US19367 | Priority number, date | US19990143835P | 14.07.1999 Original published format: US 143835 P | US20000480011 | 10.01.2000 Original published format: US 480011 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105152 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203491 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203491 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04M3/533 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
H04L12/2801 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (US);
H04L51/10 (EP);
H04M3/5307 (EP,US);
H04N21/43074 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/4786 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/85406 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US);
H04M3/5322 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/17] |
Former [2004/22] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON NACHRICHTEN IN EINEM KABEL ODER SATELLITENTEILNEHMERSYSTEM | [2002/19] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MULTIMEDIA MESSAGING IN A CABLE OR SATELLITE SUBSCRIBER SYSTEM | [2002/19] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE MESSAGERIE MULTIMEDIA DANS UN SYSTEME D'ABONNEMENT AU CABLE OU AU SATELLITE | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2015 | 16.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | [2017/04] |
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0788065 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,13,20,25 * page 2, line 35 - line 42 *; | [A]WO9734410 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,13,20,25* page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 3 *; | [A]EP0825752 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,13,20,25 * page 2, line 22 - line 24 *; | [A]US5872926 (LEVAC RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1,13,20,25 * column 1, line 62 - line 67 * * column 2, line 9 - line 13 * | Examination | EP0749221 | WO9749239 | by applicant | EP0749221 | EP0788065 | WO9734410 | EP0825752 | US5872926 |