|
28.06.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.10.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
20.03.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2002 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
13.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.12.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.04.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
27 |