EP1274619 - FORM WITH DETACHABLE OR REMOVABLE CARD, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING PARTS OF A MATERIAL TO BE DISPENSED ON A MOVING PRINTING CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fofitec AG Hembrunnstrasse 6 5605 Dottikon / CH | [2003/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Jules Neumattweg 6 CH-8967 Widen / CH | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Joachim Stapferstrasse 5 Postfach 2651 8033 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Lauer, Joachim Stapferstrasse 5 Postfach 2651 8033 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00949038.4 | 07.08.2000 | [2003/03] | WO2000CH00418 | Priority number, date | CH19990001453 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: CH 145399 | CH19990001634 | 08.09.1999 Original published format: CH 163499 | [2003/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0110701 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1274619 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1274619 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62C3/00 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B26D3/085 (EP,US);
B26D7/088 (EP);
B26D7/20 (EP);
B26F1/44 (EP);
B42D25/00 (EP);
B42D5/027 (EP);
B65H35/0006 (EP);
B65H39/14 (EP);
B26D2007/202 (EP);
B26F2001/4472 (EP);
B42D25/45 (EP);
B42D25/475 (EP);
B65H2701/1914 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULAR MIT HERAUS- ODER ABTRENNBARER KARTE SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFSPENDEN VON FOLIEN UND PAPIEREN | [2003/03] | English: | FORM WITH DETACHABLE OR REMOVABLE CARD, AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING PARTS OF A MATERIAL TO BE DISPENSED ON A MOVING PRINTING CARRIER | [2003/03] | French: | FORMULAIRE AVEC CARTE RETIRABLE OU SEPARABLE, ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR DISTRIBUER DES PARTIES D'UN MATERIAU A DISTRIBUER SUR OU DANS UN SUPPORT D'IMPRESSION EN DEPLACEMENT | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 13.04.2005 | CY | 07.08.2005 | LU | 07.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | IE | 13.04.2005 | |
CY | 07.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | IE | 13.04.2005 | |
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | IE | 13.04.2005 | |
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | IE | 13.04.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3850059 (KANG P) [A] 15 * abstract *; | [XY]US4397704 (FRICK RICHARD H) [X] 6,7,9,11,12,17,21,33 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 17; figure 1 * [Y] 7,8,30; | [A]US4549454 (YAMASHITA KYOUICHI [JP]) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [X]US5172938 (SCHMIDT ERIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0568414 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [A] 7 * page 9, line 43 - line 57; figures 1,6,7 *; | [YA]EP0608152 (MAGNAFLEX SYSTEMS LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 7,8,30 * the whole document * [A] 31; | [A]US5429576 (DODERER-WINKLER ALFRED [DE]) [A] 27 * abstract *; | [A]EP0733490 (FISCHER FOLIEN AG [CH]); | [DA]WO9716370 (HUNKELER JOS PAPIERVERARBEIT [CH], et al); | [X]US5705243 (MEHTA RAJENDRA [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9813213 (FOFITEC AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]WO9826938 (FOFITEC AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 19, paragraph 2; figure 16C *; | [XAY]WO9841401 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 6,7,9,11,12,18,19,33 * page 5, line 13 - page 9, line 12; figure 1 * * abstract * [A] 32 [Y] 7,8,30; | [T]WO9962801 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) |