EP1202766 - NEEDLELESS SYRINGE COMPRISING AN INJECTOR WITH NESTED ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crossject 12, Quai Henri IV 75181 Paris Cedex 04 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states CROSSJECT 12, Quai Henri IV 75181 Paris Cedex 04 / FR | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states CROSSJET 12, Quai Henri IV 75181 Paris Cedex 04 / FR | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states SNPE 12, Quai Henri IV 75181 Paris Cedex 04 / FR | ||
For all designated states Cross Site Technologies 42, rue de Longvic 21300 Chenove / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDRE, Patrick 14, avenue de la Libération F-70100 Gray / FR | 02 /
BROUQUIERES, Bernard 4, rue Sandin F-83100 Toulon / FR | 03 /
MIKLER, Claude 117, avenue du Drapeau F-21000 Dijon / FR | 04 /
NAVELIER, Alain Quartier Figou F-83390-Pierrefeu du Var / FR | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/16] |
Former [2002/22] | Waligorski, Carol, et al SNPE - Service Propriété Industrielle 12, Quai Henri IV 75181 Paris Cedex 04 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00949593.8 | 30.06.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000FR01851 | Priority number, date | FR19990009252 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909252 | [2002/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105454 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1202766 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1202766 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/30 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
A61M5/30 (EP,US);
A61M5/3007 (EP,US);
A61M5/3134 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NADELLOSE SPRITZE MIT INEINANDERGEFÜGTEN INJEKTORELEMENTEN | [2002/19] | English: | NEEDLELESS SYRINGE COMPRISING AN INJECTOR WITH NESTED ELEMENTS | [2002/19] | French: | SERINGUE SANS AIGUILLE AVEC INJECTEUR A ELEMENTS EMBOITES | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 23.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1378829 (C. DEUTSCH) [A] 1,12 * page 5, column L, line 42 - line 45; figure 1 *; | [AD]US3788315 (LAURENS S) [AD] 1,12* figure - *; | [A]EP0370571 (HOLZER WALTER) [A] 1,12 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5074843 (DALTO TINO [FR], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 15 - line 18; figure 3 *; | [A]DE19607922 (GRUND KARL ERNST PROF [DE]) [A] 1,4-6,12 * column 6, line 16 - line 43 * * figures 1.5-1.7 * |