EP1201072 - TEST METHOD FOR COMPUTER TELEPHONY LINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYNOLDS, Richard John Buchan 5 Hill House Road Ipswich Suffolk IP3 8AP / GB | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al British Telecommunications PLC, BT Group Legal Services, Int. Prop. Dep., 8th Floor, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00949731.4 | 28.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000GB02927 | Priority number, date | EP19990306268 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: EP 99306268 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111854 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1201072 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201072 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/22, H04M7/00 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
H04M3/2236 (EP);
H04M3/2227 (EP);
H04M7/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Title | German: | PRÜFVERFAHREN FÜR COMPUTERTELEFONIE-VERBINDUNGEN | [2002/18] | English: | TEST METHOD FOR COMPUTER TELEPHONY LINKS | [2002/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE POUR LIAISONS TELEPHONIQUES INFORMATIQUES | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | BE | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | CY | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | ES | 13.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | LU | 28.07.2007 | IE | 30.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
IE | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 02.11.2006 | |
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 02.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9731492 (IBM [US], et al) [X] 15,16 * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 19; figures 6,7 * [A] 5-13; | [A]EP0855824 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9909730 (U S ROBOTICS MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 9 - line 29 * * claims 1-23 * * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 36; figures 2,3 *; | [A] - RUDKIN S ET AL, "REAL-TIME APPLICATIONS ON THE INTERNET", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL,GB,BT LABORATORIES, vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 1358-3948, page 209-225, XP000703571 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018661430115 | [A] - MAESHIMA O; ITO Y; ISHIKURA M; ASAMI T, "A method of service quality estimation with a network measurement tool", IEEE INTERNATIONAL PERFORMANCE, COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, PROCEEDINGS OF IPCCC'99, SCOTTSDALE, AZ, USA, piscataway, NJ,USA,IEEE,USA, (19990210), pages 201 - 209, XP002125290 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - D'HOOGE H, "THE COMMUNICATING PC", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, vol. 34, no. 4, ISSN 0163-6804, page 36-42, XP000586068 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.489710 |