EP1327599 - ELEVATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDA, Takenobu Mitsubishi Denki KK, 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00950050.5 | 09.08.2000 | [2003/29] | WO2000JP05335 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212108 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327599 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327599 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B11/08, B66B7/04, B66B7/02, B66B5/28, B66B5/24, D07B1/14 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
B66B11/008 (EP);
B66B11/08 (EP);
B66B7/047 (EP,US);
B66B7/06 (EP,KR);
D07B1/145 (EP,US);
D07B1/162 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/29] | B66B11/08, B66B7/04, B66B5/28, B66B7/02, B66B5/02, B66B7/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUFZUGSANORDNUNG | [2003/29] | English: | ELEVATOR DEVICE | [2003/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELEVATEUR | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | Translation filed | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06015383.0 / EP1710192 | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9816681 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [Y]JPS59164450 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850125), vol. 009, no. 018, Database accession no. (M - 353), & JP59164450 A 19840917 (TOSHIBA KK) [Y] 3 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9816681 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]); | [Y]JPH0618371U ; | [Y]JPS55151479 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH0468082U ; | [Y]JPH09110334 (HITACHI BUILDING SYST CO LTD); | [Y]US4434873 (OHTA KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]JPS52109251 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]US5855254 (BLOCHLE HANS G [CH]); | [A]US5566786 (DE ANGELIS CLAUDIO [CH], et al); | [A]JPS594589 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS61165978U ; | [A]JP2000212885 (INVENTIO AG) |