EP1198886 - ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT FOR DETECTING A CHANGE RELATIVE TO A QUIESCENT CONDITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allsym B.V. Rotterdamseweg 139a 2628 AL Delft / NL | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEZINNE, Jan Lindenlaan 20 NL-1544 AT Zaandijk / NL | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00950070.3 | 24.07.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000NL00522 | Priority number, date | NL19991012710 | 26.07.1999 Original published format: NL 1012710 | [2002/17] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0108309 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1198886 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198886 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/95 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
H03K17/9547 (EP,US);
H03K17/95 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/39] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE SCHALTUNG ZUR DETEKTION EINER VERÄNDERUNG BEZÜGLICH EINES RUHESTANDS | [2002/17] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT FOR DETECTING A CHANGE RELATIVE TO A QUIESCENT CONDITION | [2002/17] | French: | CIRCUIT ELECTRONIQUE DE DETECTION D'UN CHANGEMENT PAR RAPPORT A UN ETAT DE REPOS | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2001 | Translation filed | 01.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 05.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2003 | BE | 24.09.2003 | CH | 24.09.2003 | CY | 24.09.2003 | FI | 24.09.2003 | IT | 24.09.2003 | LI | 24.09.2003 | DK | 24.12.2003 | GR | 24.12.2003 | SE | 24.12.2003 | ES | 04.01.2004 | PT | 24.02.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
IT | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
CY | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
ES | 04.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
DK | 24.12.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
BE | 24.09.2003 | ||
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
SE | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
FI | 24.09.2003 | ||
GR | 24.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 24.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4574936 (KLINGER LANCE [US]) [DX] 1,2,4,11 * column 3, line 38 - column 10, line 59 * * column 5, line 37 - line 65 * * figure - *; | [A]DE3527650 (PEPPERL & FUCHS [DE]) [A] 1* column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19611810 (BALLUFF GEBHARD GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 13 - line 66; figure 3 *; | [A] - J. YAMASAKI ET AL., "Torque Sensors Using Wire Explosion Magnetostrictive Alloy Layers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS., IEEE INC. NEW YORK., US, (198609), vol. 22, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 403 - 405, XP002134483 [A] 1 * page 405, column L, line 1 - line 5; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.1986.1064494 |