EP1203366 - AUTOMATICALLY DETERMINING THE ACCURACY OF A PRONUNCIATION DICTIONARY IN A SPEECH RECOGNITION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speechworks International, Inc. 695 Atlantic Avenue, Third Floor Boston, MA 02201 / US | [2002/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNARD, Etienne Apt. 2207, 5700 Bunker Hill Street Pittsburgh, PA 15206 / US | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00950240.2 | 23.06.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000US17209 | Priority number, date | US19990344164 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: US 344164 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0079517 | Date: | 28.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203366 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203366 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
G10L15/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE BESTIMMUNG DER GENAUIGKEIT EINES AUSSPRACHEWÖRTERBUCHS IN EINEM SPRACHERKENNUNGSSYSTEM | [2002/47] | English: | AUTOMATICALLY DETERMINING THE ACCURACY OF A PRONUNCIATION DICTIONARY IN A SPEECH RECOGNITION SYSTEM | [2002/19] | French: | DETERMINATION AUTOMATIQUE DE L'EXACTITUDE D'UN DICTIONNAIRE DE PRONONCIATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE | [2002/19] |
Former [2002/19] | AUTOMATISCHE BESTIMMUNG DER GENAUIGKEIT EINES AUSSPRACHEWÖRTERBUCH IN EINEM SPRACHERKENNUNGSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2003 | BE | 27.08.2003 | CH | 27.08.2003 | CY | 27.08.2003 | FI | 27.08.2003 | IT | 27.08.2003 | LI | 27.08.2003 | NL | 27.08.2003 | DK | 27.11.2003 | GR | 27.11.2003 | ES | 08.12.2003 | PT | 27.01.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
CY | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
ES | 08.12.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
ES | 08.12.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 27.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0392537 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,12,16-19 * abstract * * column 2, lines 14-30 *; | [X]US5170432 (HACKBARTH HEIDI [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,16,20 * abstract ** column 2, lines 22-59 *; | [X]US5710864 (JUANG BIING-HWANG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,12,16-19 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 28 *; | [X] - 281 - 286, "A NEW APPROACH TO SPEAKER ADAPTATION BY MODELLING PRONUNCIATION IN AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION", SPEECH COMMUNICATION,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19931201), vol. 13, no. 3/04, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 281 - 286, XP000421440 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6393(93)90026-H | [X] - IMAI T ET AL, "A NEW METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC GENERATION OF SPEAKER-DEPENDENT PHONOLOGICAL RULES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19950509), ISBN 0-7803-2432-3, pages 864 - 867, XP000658131 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1995.479831 | [X] - PISTER-BOURJOT C ET AL, "Automatic learning: an approach to the adaptation of a speech recognition system to one or several speakers", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, MARCH 1987, NETHERLANDS, vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 43 - 54, XP002151946 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6393(87)90068-9 | [X] - MCINNES F R ET AL, "TEMPLATE ADAPTATION IN AN ISOLATED WORD-RECOGNITION SYSTEM", IEE PROCEEDINGS I. SOLID- STATE & ELECTRON DEVICES,GB,INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, (19890401), vol. 136, no. 2, ISSN 0956-3776, pages 119 - 126, XP000009158 [X] 1-5,8,9,12,13,16-20 * the whole document * |