EP1224033 - MAILING MACHINE INCLUDING A STRIPPER BLADE HAVING A RAISED EDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Opposition withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | 17.11.2017 | Opposition rejected | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0790 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKSTROM, David, W. 201 River Road Roxbury, CT 06783 / US | 02 /
THRAILKILL, Patrick, T. 137 Woodin Street Hamden, Connecticut 06514 / US | [2010/34] |
Former [2002/37] | 01 /
BECKSTROM, David, W. 212 York Road Fairfield, CT 06432 / US | ||
02 /
THRAILKILL, Patrick, T. 137 Woodin Street Hamdin, Connecticut 06544 / US | |||
Former [2002/30] | 01 /
BECKSTROM, David, W. 212 York Road Fairfield, CT 06432 / US | ||
02 /
THRAILKILL, Patrick, T. 636 Orange Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00950718.7 | 26.07.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000US20339 | Priority number, date | US19990364079 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: US 364079 | [2002/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0108813 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224033 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224033 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/02, B43M5/00, B65H9/00, B43M5/04 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B43M5/042 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/30] | B05C1/02, B43M5/00, B65H9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUVERTIERVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER KLINGENABSTREIFANORDNUNG MIT HOHER KANTE | [2002/30] | English: | MAILING MACHINE INCLUDING A STRIPPER BLADE HAVING A RAISED EDGE | [2002/30] | French: | MACHINE A TRAITER LE COURRIER COMPORTANT UNE LAME DE SEPARATION A BORD RELEVE | [2002/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2011
06.11.2017
WITHDRAWN Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al, et al Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [2017/51] |
Former [2015/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2011
15.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg & Partner Patentanwälte (GbR), et al, et al Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2011
15.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Prenzlauer Promenade 28 13089 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Eckert, Lars, et al, et al Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskorn, Eckert Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2011
15.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Eckert, Lars, et al, et al Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskorn, Eckert Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | 15.07.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.11.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.01.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.11.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/51] | Appeal following opposition | 23.01.2014 | Appeal received No. T0183/14 | 13.05.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | IE | 26.07.2011 | LU | 26.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB175467 (STANDARD ENVELOPE SEALER MFG C) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3996727 (IRVINE ROBERT, et al) [Y] 1-8 * see abstract; column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 31; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3337488 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0455387 (PITNEY BOWES PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * see abstract; column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0540292 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4971686 (O'DEA KEVIN J [US], et al); | [A]US5022953 (FASSMAN ARNOLD [US], et al); | [A]US5138816 (HOLBROOK RUSSELL W [US], et al); | [Y]US5385627 (WEIMER CHARLES M [US]) | Examination | US4551188 | US5209806 | US5489358 | US6477512 | US6499020 | by applicant | US3859955 | US3996727 | US4450037 | US4643123 | US4775143 | US4903633 | US4926787 | US4971686 | US5006194 | US5022953 | EP0455287 | US5138816 | US5385627 | US5569327 | US5746881 | US6477512 | US6499020 |