EP1206700 - METHODS FOR ANALYZING PROTEIN BINDING EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signature Bioscience inc. 1450 Rollins Road Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2002/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEFTI, John 226 28th Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2002/21] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/21] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00950759.1 | 27.07.2000 | [2002/21] | WO2000US20420 | Priority number, date | US19990365580 | 02.08.1999 Original published format: US 365580 | [2002/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0109606 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1206700 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
H01J49/04 (EP,US);
G01N2333/42 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4712 (EP,US);
G01N2333/723 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR ANALYSIERUNG VON PROTEINBINDUNGSEREIGNISSEN | [2002/21] | English: | METHODS FOR ANALYZING PROTEIN BINDING EVENTS | [2002/21] | French: | METHODES D'ANALYSE D'EVENEMENTS DE LIAISONS DE PROTEINES | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9308464 (HOLM KENNEDY JAMES W [US]) [A] 1-45 * figures 3B,5 *; | [X]US5656428 (MCALLISTER DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * column 8, line 66 - column 12, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9809168 (BIOTECHNOLOGY RES & DEV [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9831839 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [X] 1-45 * page 28, line 26 - page 31, line 18; figures 14,15 *; | [DPX]WO9939190 (SIGNATURE BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [DPX] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0045170 (SIGNATURE BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [E] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [X] - AMO YUKO ET AL, "Dielectric measurements of lysozyme and tri-N-acetyl-D-glucosamine association at radio and microwave frequencies.", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, (1997), vol. 12, no. 9-10, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 953 - 958, XP000972664 [X] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(97)00030-4 | [X] - HIANIK, T., "Biosensors based on solid supported lipid bilayers and their physical properties", NATO ASI SER., SER. 2 (1997), 38(BIOSENSORS FOR DIRECT MONITORING OF ENVIRONMENTAL POLLUTANTS IN FIELD), 317-333, XP000974403 [X] 1-45 * page 323 - page 325 * | [A] - SMITH GEOFF ET AL, "Dielectric Relaxation Spectroscopy and Some Applications in the Pharmaceutical Sciences.", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1995), vol. 84, no. 9, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1029 - 1044, XP000971371 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600840902 |