EP1203218 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING CELLULAR ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1200 East California Boulevard Mail Code 210-85 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard, Mail Code 201-85 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEARMAN, Gregory, H. 974 East Elizabeth Pasadena, CA 91104 / US | 02 /
FRASER, Scott, E. 503 Dartmouth Place LaCanada-Flintridge, CA 91011 / US | 03 /
LANSFORD, Russell, D. 522 E. Miramar Avenue Claremont, CA 91711 / US | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Heunemann, Dieter Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Heunemann, Dieter Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00950844.1 | 28.07.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000US20591 | Priority number, date | US19990146490P | 30.07.1999 Original published format: US 146490 P | US19990164504P | 09.11.1999 Original published format: US 164504 P | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0109592 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203218 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N33/543 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6417 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
Y10S435/968 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON ZELLULÄREN AKTIVITÄT | [2002/19] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MONITORING CELLULAR ACTIVITY | [2002/19] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE L'ACTIVITE CELLULAIRE | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 28.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/30] | 16.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/30] | Appeal following examination | 27.02.2009 | Appeal received No. T1409/09 | 24.04.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.03.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 16.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP05004884.2 / EP1553402 | EP08169179.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 16.12.2008 | EP08169180.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 16.12.2008 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2004 | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9622521 (SOINI ERKKI [FI], et al) [X] 1-33 * page 14; figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5891738 (SOINI ERKKI [FI], et al) [A] 1-33 * column 15, line 40 - line 55 *; | [A]US5674743 (ULMER KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1-33 * figure 9 *; | [A]EP0916981 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-33 * figure 3 *; | [A]US4905169 (BUICAN TUDOR N [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * figure 7 *; | [A]US5117466 (BUICAN TUDOR N [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5814820 (DONG CHEN-YUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO9937999 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-33 * figure 1 * |