EP1118149 - A DC/DC BUCK-BOOST CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/30] | A DC/DC UP/DOWN CONVERTER | ||
[2008/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLUIJS, Ferdinand, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors B.V. IP&L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/30] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00951420.9 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/30] | WO2000EP06977 | Priority number, date | EP19990202552 | 03.08.1999 Original published format: EP 99202552 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0113502 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118149 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118149 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H02M3/1582 (EP,US);
H02M3/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFWÄRTS/ABWÄRTSGLEICHSTROMWANDLER | [2001/30] | English: | A DC/DC BUCK-BOOST CONVERTER | [2008/23] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR CONTINU-CONTINU ELEVATEUR/ABAISSEUR | [2001/30] |
Former [2001/30] | A DC/DC UP/DOWN CONVERTER | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 23.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.11.2008 | [2009/25] | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5552694 (APPELTANS KOEN E J [NL]) [AD] 1 * column 9, line 30 - line 67 * * figure 8 *; | [A]US5748457 (POON FRANKI NGAI KIT [HK], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 10- line 15, line 37- line 66 ** figure 4B * |