EP1208206 - MORAXELLA CATARRHALIS ANTIGEN BASB121 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals s.a. rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS S.A. 89 rue de l'Institut 1330 Rixensart / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thonnard, Joelle, SmithKline Beecham Biol. S.A. Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00951465.4 | 27.07.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000EP07281 | Priority number, date | GB19990018040 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9918040 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0109330 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1208206 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/21, A61K39/02, C07K16/12, G01N33/53, A61K31/70, A61K39/40 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C07K14/212 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MORAXELLA CATARRHALIS ANTIGEN BASB121 | [2002/22] | English: | MORAXELLA CATARRHALIS ANTIGEN BASB121 | [2002/22] | French: | MORAXELLA CATARRHALIS ANTIGENE BASB121 | [2002/22] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9732980 (CONNAUGHT LAB [CA], et al); |