EP1172295 - AUTOMATIC PACKAGING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2004 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLPAK, S.A. Poligono Industrial Urvasa Calle Vallés s/n E-08130 Santa Perpetua de Mogoda / ES | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTE RUIZ, Josep Calle Maestrat, 22 E-08192 Sant Quirze del Vallès / ES | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Sugrañes, S.L.P. Calle Provenza 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | SUGRANES - VERDONCES - FERREGÜELA Calle Provenza, 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 00951535.4 | 31.07.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000ES00294 | Priority number, date | ES19990001832 | 10.08.1999 Original published format: ES 9901832 | [2002/03] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110715 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1172295 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/02, B65B9/08 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
B65B43/465 (EP);
B65B65/003 (EP);
B65B9/08 (EP);
B65B9/093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT [2002/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE | [2002/03] | English: | AUTOMATIC PACKAGING MACHINE | [2002/03] | French: | MACHINE A EMBALLER AUTOMATIQUE | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2001 | Translation filed | 04.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/51] | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]ES2098169 ; | [Y]US4790123 ; | [A]ES2007416 ; | [A]ES2117929 |