EP1208876 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING EXERCISE STRENGTH AND DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho, Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0084 / JP | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Omron Healthcare Co., Ltd. 24, Yamanouchi, Yamanoshita-cho Ukyou-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-0084 / JP | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokouji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinoshita, Hiromi Omron Corporation 801 Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokouji- dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Shiga, Toshikazu, Omron Corporation, 801 Minamifu- doudou-cho Horikawahigashiiru,Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00951937.2 | 10.08.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000JP05371 | Priority number, date | JP19990226187 | 10.08.1999 Original published format: JP 22618799 | JP19990250035 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25003599 | [2002/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112270 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208876 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63B22/06, A61B5/22, A63B24/00 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
A63B22/0605 (EP);
A63B2230/04 (EP);
A63B2230/06 (EP);
A63B2230/062 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/22] | A63B22/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER TRAININGSKRAFT SOWIE DIESES VERFAHREN VERWENDENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2002/22] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING EXERCISE STRENGTH AND DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA FORCE D'UN EXERCICE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2002 | Translation filed | 28.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 30.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/44] | 01.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0922434 (PYLON INC [VG]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-12,15-20,22-29 * page 3, paragraph 16 - page 7, paragraph 53 * * page 1, paragraph 76 - paragraph 78; figure - * [Y] 4,5,8,9,13,14,21; | [Y]WO9620640 (POLAR ELECTRO OY [FI], et al) [Y] 4,5,8,9,13,14,21 * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 33; figure - *; | [PX]WO9943392 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-17,19-22 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1059102 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [E] 1-17,19-22 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0379227 (COMBI CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,11,24,26,28 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 15 * * page 8, line 6 - line 17; figure - * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 28 *; | [X]EP0485981 (COMBI CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,11,12,15-19,22,24,26,28 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 21 * * column 12, line 46 - column 15, line 58; figure - *; | [XA]EP0255621 (COMBI CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 20, paragraph 32 * * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 32; figure - * [A] 18; | [X]EP0842635 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 17-29 * column 1, line 10 - column 8, line 36 * * column 15, line 38 - column 19, line 12 * * column 27, line 55 - column 29, line 33; figure - *; | [A]US5277189 (JACOBS LAURENCE A [US]) [A] 23-29 * column 1, line 55 - line 68 * | International search | [X]JPH1085363 ; | [Y]JPH09187430 ; | [Y]EP0590634 ; | [Y]EP0255621 |