EP1204709 - COATING COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED SCRATCH RESISTANCE, COATED SUBSTRATES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. One PPG Place Pittsburgh, PA 15272 / US | [2002/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Lawrence, G. 165 White Oak Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | 02 /
BARKAC, Karen, A. 322 Oakridge Lane Murrysville, PA 15668 / US | 03 /
DESAW, Shawn, A. 118 Robinhood Lane McMurray, PA 15317 / US | 04 /
HARTMAN, Marvis, E. 144 Rawlins Run Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US | 05 /
HAYES, Deborah, E. 7055 Shannon Road Verona, PA 15147 / US | 06 /
HOCKSWENDER, Thomas, R. 165 Wedgewood Drive Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 07 /
KUSTER, Kymarie, L. 109 Reis Run Road Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | 08 /
NAKAJIMA, Masayuki 2604 Glenchester Drive Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 09 /
OLSON, Kurt, G. 3935 Bakerstown Road Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 10 /
SADVARY, Richard, J. 456 Fielding Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15235 / US | 11 /
SIMPSON, Dennis, A. 204 Mingo Road Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 12 /
TYEBJEE, Shiryn 8830 South Court 304 Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | 13 /
WILT, Truman, F. 154 Sandy Drive Clinton, PA 15026 / US | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Wiklund, Erik, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 00952320.0 | 31.07.2000 | [2002/20] | WO2000US20840 | Priority number, date | US19990365069 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: US 365069 | US19990171899P | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 171899 P | US20000489042 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 489042 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0109260 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204709 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204709 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, C09D201/02 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C08J3/20 (EP,US);
C08K3/01 (EP,US);
C09D7/00 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/67 (EP,US);
C09D7/68 (EP,US);
C08K2201/011 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L2666/04, C08L2666/54 (US,EP);
C09D183/04, C08L2666/14, C08L2666/54 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08L2666/54 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/07] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER KRATZFESTIGKEIT, BESCHICHTETE OBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2002/20] | English: | COATING COMPOSITIONS HAVING IMPROVED SCRATCH RESISTANCE, COATED SUBSTRATES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | [2002/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT PRESENTANT UNE RESISTANCE AMELIOREE AU EGRATIGNURES, SUBSTRATS REVETUS ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANT | [2002/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 31.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/19] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 14.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB220570 (ERSTE BRUENNER MASCHINEN FAB) [X] 62* claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0139187 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,24-38 * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 3 * * page 28, line 3 - page 29, line 16 * * page 32, line 17 - line 32 *; | [X]EP0735118 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 1,133 * claims 1-15 * * page 8, line 26 - line 27 *; | [X]EP0774499 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-39 * claims 1-14 * * page 2, line 3 - line 13 * * page 6, line 35 - line 48 * * page 6, line 52 - page 7, line 35 * * page 8, line 10 - line 13 *; | [X]WO9838251 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-41 * claims 1-3 * * page 3, line 5 - line 22 * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 29 * * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 10 * * page 5, line 13 - line 29 *; | [DX]US5853809 (CAMPBELL DONALD H [US], et al) [DX] 1-39 * claims 1-9 * * column 2, line 1 - line 13 * * column 5, line 40 - column 8, line 43 *; | [X]WO9906487 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-28 * * page 2, line 12 - line 18 * * page 3, line 10 - line 16 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 30 * * page 13, line 8 - line 25 * * page 11, line 19 - line 29 *; | [X]EP0897962 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [X] 1,133 * claims 1-4,6-19 * * page 20, line 52 - line 58 * * page 2, line 6 - line 10 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 16 * |