EP1210794 - DYNAMIC CONTROL OF TALK GROUPS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/23] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC CONTROL OF TALK GROUPS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK | ||
[2010/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALLAWAY, Edgar, Herbert, Jr. 11524 Clear Creek Place Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, Christopher, T. 115 Hendricks Isle Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2002/23] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00952394.5 | 02.08.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000US21029 | Priority number, date | US19990370539 | 09.08.1999 Original published format: US 370539 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111830 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210794 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1210794 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/06, // H04W84/18 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
H04W74/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/20 (KR);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | H04L12/28, // H04Q7/38 | ||
Former IPC [2002/23] | H04L12/42, H04L12/403 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2002/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE STEUERUNG VON SPRACHGRUPPEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZ | [2010/02] | English: | DYNAMIC CONTROL OF TALK GROUPS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK | [2010/02] | French: | COMMANDE DYNAMIQUE DE GROUPES D'APPEL DANS UN RESEAU SANS FIL | [2010/02] |
Former [2002/23] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DYNAMISCHEN STEUERUNG VON SPRACHGRUPPEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZ | ||
Former [2002/23] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DYNAMIC CONTROL OF TALK GROUPS IN A WIRELESS NETWORK | ||
Former [2002/23] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DYNAMIQUE DE GROUPES D'APPEL DANS UN RESEAU SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | IE | 02.08.2010 | LU | 02.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/35] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 02.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
NL | 14.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5530914 (MCPHETERS LAURA L [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 33 - line 65 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5619553 (YOUNG PHILIP A [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 53 * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]US5699409 (KOJIMA SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - line 35 * * column 4, line 56 - line 67 * * column 5, line 18 - line 27 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]US5903618 (MIYAKE MASAYASU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 29 - line 48 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 15 * * column 7, line 27 - line 67 * * column 8, line 35 - line 46 * * column 9, line 3 - line 42 * * figures 1,10,11 *; | [Y]WO9937106 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 32 * * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 5 *; | [A]WO9938345 (DOSCH & AMAND GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 11 * * page 3, line 23 - line 28 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 18 * * page 9, line 4 - line 8 * * figures 1a,1b * | International search | [Y]US4872003 (YOSHIDA IKIO [JP]); | [Y]US4924461 (AMEMIYA SHIGEO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5485464 (STRODTBECK ANDREW L [US], et al) |