EP1204893 - THREE DIMENSIONAL IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1 6TD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1 6TD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENAWAY, Alan, Howard DERA Malvern, St. Andrews Road Malvern, Worcs WR14 3PS / GB | 02 /
BLANCHARD, Paul, Michael DERA Malvern, St. Andrews Road Malvern, Worcs WR14 3PS / GB | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver Intellectual Property Department DERA Farnborough, A4 Bldg, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants. GU14 OLX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver Intellectual Property Department DERA Farnborough, A4 Bldg, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants. GU14 OLX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00953288.8 | 15.08.2000 | [2002/20] | WO2000GB03085 | Priority number, date | GB19990019497 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9919497 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0113159 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204893 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204893 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10, G11B7/135, G02B27/00, G02B5/18, G02B5/32 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
G11B7/1353 (EP);
G11B7/1381 (EP);
G11B7/14 (EP);
G11B2007/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/51] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/20] | English: | THREE DIMENSIONAL IMAGING SYSTEM | [2002/20] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2002/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 18.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.2002 | BE | 18.12.2002 | CH | 18.12.2002 | GR | 18.12.2002 | LI | 18.12.2002 | DK | 18.03.2003 | PT | 18.03.2003 | CY | 15.08.2003 | FI | 15.08.2003 | IE | 15.08.2003 | LU | 15.08.2003 | SE | 16.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
CY | 15.08.2003 | ||
FI | 15.08.2003 | ||
IE | 15.08.2003 | ||
LU | 15.08.2003 | ||
SE | 16.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
CY | 15.08.2003 | ||
FI | 15.08.2003 | ||
LU | 15.08.2003 | ||
SE | 16.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
CY | 15.08.2003 | ||
FI | 15.08.2003 | ||
SE | 16.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
FI | 15.08.2003 | ||
SE | 16.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/24] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
SE | 16.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
CH | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LI | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 18.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4467188 (SUZUKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4701005 (NOGUCHI MASARU [JP]) [A] 1,2* column 5, line 58 - column 7, line 35; figure 21 *; | [XY]US4849825 (KURATA YUKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 20; figures 2,3; claim 1 * [Y] 2; | [DA]EP0517491 (IBM [US]) [DA] 1-6 * column 12, line 58 - column 17, line 32; figures 10,15,16,21 *; | [X]US5278817 (MAEDA HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * column 8, lines 4-52; figures 8,17,26 * * column 13, lines 5-63 * * column 13, lines 16-26 *; | [X]US5933277 (TROXELL JOHN RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * column 6, lines 32-65; figure 5 * |