EP1271366 - ENERGY-SAVING ASSISTING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HOUSEHOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kojima, Yusuke 4-1, Hiraisanso Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-0817 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Kojima, Yusuke 4-1, Hiraisanso Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0817 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00953459.5 | 17.08.2000 | [2003/01] | WO2000JP05500 | Priority number, date | JP19990232019 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23201999 | JP19990279066 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27906699 | JP20000097501 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000097501 | JP20000243761 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000243761 | [2003/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0113294 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271366 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
H02J2310/14 (EP);
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y02B70/3225 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2003/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM HELFEN UM IN EINEM HAUSHALT ENERGIE ZU SPAREN | [2003/01] | English: | ENERGY-SAVING ASSISTING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR HOUSEHOLD | [2003/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE MAITRISE ET D'ECONOMIES D'ENERGIE POUR LES MENAGES | [2003/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2002 | Translation filed | 04.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 06.06.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [A]JPH02270062 (GOTO SHIGERU, et al); | [Y]JPH0518995 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al); | [Y]JPH0850501 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO, et al); | [Y]JPH0922432 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH09259203 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH1049552 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD); | [Y]JPH1166175 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH11119846 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [XP]JPH11328152 (TOSHIBA CORP) |