EP1199978 - LUMINOUS GLUCOSE MONITORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD 0377/AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Dept. 377/ AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-6050 / US | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-6050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENDROCK, Charles 23 Tippling Rock Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00953741.6 | 28.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000US20712 | Priority number, date | US19990362205 | 28.07.1999 Original published format: US 362205 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0108551 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199978 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199978 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
G01N33/48785 (EP,US);
Y10T436/144444 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTENDE GLUKOSEÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/18] | English: | LUMINOUS GLUCOSE MONITORING DEVICE | [2002/18] | French: | DETECTEUR DE GLUCOSE LUMINEUX | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | CY | 28.07.2005 | IE | 28.07.2005 | LU | 28.07.2005 | ES | 29.07.2005 | FR | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GB | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | PT | 07.11.2005 | DE | 01.02.2006 | [2008/45] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 28.07.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
LU | 28.07.2005 | ||
ES | 29.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 28.07.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
LU | 28.07.2005 | ||
ES | 29.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 28.07.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
ES | 29.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 01.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
ES | 29.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 01.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 28.07.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2154003 (GENETICS INT INC) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9215373 (PRO GLOW SPORTS INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 9 *; | [Y]WO9918848 (CASTANO JAIME A [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]US5925012 (MURPHY-CHUTORIAN DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-11* column W * | Examination | US5366609 | US5440458 |