EP1216081 - INTEGRATED LOTTERY POUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pollard Banknote Limited Partnership 1499 Buffalo Place Winnipeg MB R3T 1L7 / CA | [2006/05] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Pollard Amalco Inc. 1499 Buffalo Place Winnipeg MB R3T 1L7 / CA | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Pollard Banknote Limited 1499 Buffalo Place Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 17L / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCRYMGEOUR, Lyle, Harold Box 9, Group 4 R.R. 1 Dugald, Manitoba R0E 0K0 / CA | 02 /
BRICKWOOD, Michael, John 3 McMahon Place Winnipeg, Manitoba R3W 1H1 / CA | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00954240.8 | 25.08.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000CA00987 | Priority number, date | US19990406688 | 27.09.1999 Original published format: US 406688 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123054 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216081 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216081 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/06 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
A63F3/0665 (EP,US);
A63F3/069 (EP,US);
Y10S283/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/26] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER LOTTERIEBEUTEL | [2002/26] | English: | INTEGRATED LOTTERY POUCH | [2002/26] | French: | POCHETTE DE LOTERIE INTEGREE | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 25.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Request for further processing for: | 25.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2007 | BE | 11.07.2007 | CY | 11.07.2007 | DK | 11.07.2007 | FI | 11.07.2007 | NL | 11.07.2007 | LU | 25.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | SE | 11.10.2007 | GR | 12.10.2007 | ES | 22.10.2007 | PT | 11.12.2007 | [2013/51] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
LU | 25.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
IT | 25.08.2007 | ||
LU | 25.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
LU | 25.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
CY | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
SE | 11.10.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
DK | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
BE | 11.07.2007 | ||
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.10.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 11.07.2007 | |
FI | 11.07.2007 | ||
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 11.07.2007 | |
NL | 11.07.2007 | ||
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
PT | 11.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 11.07.2007 | |
ES | 22.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 22.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5217258 (SANDERSON JOHN H [CA]) [A] 1,14* column W *; | [AD]US5562284 (STEVENS MARK [US]) [AD] 1,14 * figure - *; | [A]US5618112 (LOVELL JOHN G [US]) [A] 1,14 * column W *; | [AD]WO9857715 (POLLARD BANKNOTE LTD [CA]) [AD] 1,14 * figure - * | by applicant | US4174857 | US5253899 | US5562284 | WO9857715 |