EP1113909 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A CUTTING GAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter Automatik GmbH Ostring 19 63762 Grossostheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states RIETER AUTOMATIK GmbH Ostring 19 D-63762 Grossostheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Horst Helmutstrasse 15 D-55311 Bingen / DE | 02 /
SCHULER, Michael Sonnenstrasse 4 D-63762 Grossostheim / DE | 03 /
HARWARTH, Georg Königsberger Strasse 11 D-63755 Alzenau / DE | [2003/19] |
Former [2001/28] | 01 /
MÜLLER, Horst Helmutstrasse 15 D-55311 Bingen / DE | ||
02 /
SCHULER, Michael Sonnenstrasse 4 D-63762 Grossostheim / DE | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00954494.1 | 13.07.2000 | [2001/28] | WO2000EP06693 | Priority number, date | DE1999133497 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19933497 | [2001/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0105562 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113909 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113909 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
B26D7/2628 (EP,US);
B26D7/26 (KR);
B29B9/06 (EP,US);
B26D1/385 (EP,US);
Y10S83/906 (EP,US);
Y10T83/148 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/20] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNEIDSPALTEINSTELLUNG | [2001/28] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A CUTTING GAP | [2001/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LE REGLAGE DU JEU DE COUPE | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 25.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.05.2003 | IE | 14.05.2003 | CY | 13.07.2003 | LU | 13.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | DK | 14.08.2003 | GR | 14.08.2003 | PT | 14.08.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.05.2003 | |
CY | 13.07.2003 | ||
LU | 13.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 14.05.2003 | |
CY | 13.07.2003 | ||
LU | 13.07.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 14.05.2003 | |
CY | 13.07.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 14.05.2003 | |
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 14.05.2003 | |
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 14.08.2003 | |
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR555151 (MOLINS) [A] 1,15 * page 2, line 90 - page 3, line 6; figure - *; | [A]US2782853 (HEFFELFINGER ROBERT D); | [DA]DE3620015 (BUFE FRITZ, et al) [DA] 1,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2266487 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) |