EP1236037 - SENSOR ACCOMMODATED IN A HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 Postfach 235 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2006/40] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Sensirion AG Eggbühlstrasse 14 8052 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYER, Felix Viktoriastrasse 38 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
HORNUNG, Mark Michelstrasse 2 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00954828.0 | 06.09.2000 | [2002/36] | WO2000IB01250 | Priority number, date | CH19990002191 | 30.11.1999 Original published format: CH 219199 | [2002/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0140784 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1236037 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236037 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, G01N33/00 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/0014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/36] | G01N27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOR IN EINEM GEHÄUSE | [2002/36] | English: | SENSOR ACCOMMODATED IN A HOUSING | [2002/36] | French: | CAPTEUR PLACE DANS UN BOITIER | [2002/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | FI | 10.10.2007 | IE | 10.10.2007 | NL | 10.10.2007 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | ES | 21.01.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/13] | DK | 10.10.2007 | |
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | DK | 10.10.2007 | |
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 10.10.2007 | |
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 10.10.2007 | |
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 10.10.2007 | |
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5388443 (MANAKA JUNJI [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]WO9827411 (LAB FUER PHYSIKALISCHE ELEKTRO [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * |