EP1142704 - LAMINATED FILM AND VAPOR DEPOSITION FILM USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANE, Nobuhisa 16-A2-11, Takehana Jizojiminamimachi, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 607-8088 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO, Kokichi 15-11, Yomei-cho Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0226 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, Masahiro 10-A5-22, Sonoyama 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0842 / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00954976.7 | 24.08.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000JP05691 | Priority number, date | JP19990240851 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24085199 | [2001/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115900 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142704 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/34 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B38/0008 (US);
B32B2307/538 (US);
B32B2307/7244 (US);
B32B2307/7246 (US);
B32B2310/14 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2377/00 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
B32B2439/80 (US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31725 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31728 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31732 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31739 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31765 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTFOLIE UND DAMPFBESCHICHTETE FOLIE UNTER VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN | [2001/41] | English: | LAMINATED FILM AND VAPOR DEPOSITION FILM USING THE SAME | [2001/41] | French: | COUCHE MINCE STRATIFIEE ET COUCHE MINCE A DEPOT PAR EVPORATION L'UTILISANT | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2001 | Translation filed | 23.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 28.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04270655 ; | [Y]EP0527237 (MITSUBISHI KASEI POLYTEC CO [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * example 9 *; | [Y]JPH1024489 ; | [Y]AU2570088 ; | [Y]EP0460796 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 5, line 47 - page 6, line 15 *; | [AP]JP2000202968 ; | [A]JPH07125132 ; | [A]JPH1148393 ; | [A]EP0806448 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 16 - page 11, line 30 * * page 4, line 31; example - *; | [PA]EP0960903 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [PA] 1-14 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0105]; examples 6,6,7,9,10,11; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930208), vol. 017, no. 064, Database accession no. (M - 1364), & JP04270655 A 19920928 (MITSUBISHI KASEI POLYTEC CO) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 14, Database accession no. 1998-153329, XP002191222 & JPH1024489 A 19980127 (UNITIKA LTD) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 29, Database accession no. 1989-206927, XP002191223 & AU2570088 A 19890525 (TRANSPAK INDS LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [AP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 55, Database accession no. 2000-581949, XP002191224 & JP2000202968 A 20000725 (TOYOBO KK) [AP] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 28, Database accession no. 1995-212235, XP002191225 & JPH07125132 A 19950516 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM CO) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11048393 A 19990223 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH06240134 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH1029264 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [E]JP2000238219 (TOYO BOSEKI) |