EP1223795 - WIRING-CONNECTING MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CIRCUIT BOARD WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1-1, 2-chome, Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1-1, 2-chome, Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | ||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Company, Ltd. 1-1, 2-chome, Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJINAWA, Tohru, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. Research & Development Center, 48, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 02 /
YUSA, Masami, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. Research & Development Center, 48, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 03 /
NOMURA, Satoyuki, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. Research & Development Center, 48, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Iaraki 300-4247 / JP | 04 /
ONO, Hiroshi, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. Research Development Center, 48, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 05 /
WATANABE, Itsuo, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. Goshomiya Works, 1150, Oaza-Goshomiya Shimodate-shi, Ibaraki 308-0866 / JP | 06 /
ARIFUKU, Motohiro, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. Goshimiya Works, 1150, Oaza-Goshomiya Shimodate-shi, Ibaraki 308-0866 / JP | 07 /
KANAZAWA, Houko, Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. Research & Development Center, 48, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibraki 300-4247 / JP | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2006/47] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, et al Von Kreisler Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Cologne / DE | ||
Former [2002/29] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisling Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00955037.7 | 25.08.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000JP05763 | Priority number, date | JP19990238409 | 25.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23840999 | JP20000092978 | 28.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000092978 | [2002/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115505 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1223795 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1223795 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/32, C09J175/04, C09J9/02, C09J4/06 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
C09J9/02 (KR);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
C08F290/067 (EP,US);
C08G18/4018 (EP,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US);
C08G18/4277 (EP,US);
C08G18/4854 (EP,US);
C08G18/6607 (EP,US);
C08G18/672 (EP,US);
C08G18/8175 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C09J4/06 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15788 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/42 (EP,US);
C08G18/8175, C08G18/42 (US,EP);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J4/06, C08F290/067 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITERBAHNENMATERIAL UND METHODE, LEITERPLATTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN HERZUSTELLEN | [2002/29] | English: | WIRING-CONNECTING MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CIRCUIT BOARD WITH THE SAME | [2002/29] | French: | MATERIAU DE CABLAGE/CONNEXION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME DANS LEQUEL ON L'UTILISE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2002 | Translation filed | 02.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 04.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06118942.9 / EP1732372 | EP08168744.4 / EP2040523 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11335641 ; | [A]US5866044 (SARAF RAVI F [US], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11335641 A 19991207 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH10130600 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JPH1197825 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH11185526 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) |