EP1200053 - STABLE HYDROGENATED LUPULONE ANTIBACTERIAL ORAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SREENIVASAN, Prem, K. 45 Woodbrook Circle Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 02 /
NABI, Nuran 58 Kinglet Drive South Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | 03 /
GAFFAR, Abdul 89 Carter Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00955309.0 | 01.08.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000US20967 | Priority number, date | US19990366892 | 04.08.1999 Original published format: US 366892 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110401 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1200053 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200053 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 18.02.2002 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILE ANTIBAKTERIELLE MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND HYDRIERTES LUPULON | [2005/28] | English: | STABLE HYDROGENATED LUPULONE ANTIBACTERIAL ORAL COMPOSITIONS | [2002/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ORALES ANTIBACTERIENNES STABLES A BASE DE LUPULONE HYDROGENEE | [2005/28] |
Former [2002/18] | STABILE ANTIBAKTERIELLE, HYDROGENIERTES LUPULON ENTHALTENDE MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2002/18] | COMPOSITIONS ORALES ANTIBACTERIENNES A BASE DE LUPULONE HYDROGENEE STABLE | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.12.2005 | CH | 21.12.2005 | CY | 21.12.2005 | FI | 21.12.2005 | LI | 21.12.2005 | NL | 21.12.2005 | DK | 21.03.2006 | GR | 21.03.2006 | DE | 22.03.2006 | ES | 01.04.2006 | PT | 22.05.2006 | GB | 01.08.2006 | IE | 01.08.2006 | LU | 01.08.2006 | SE | 02.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | FR | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
GB | 01.08.2006 | ||
IE | 01.08.2006 | ||
LU | 01.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
FR | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
GB | 01.08.2006 | ||
IE | 01.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
FR | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
GB | 01.08.2006 | ||
IE | 01.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
IE | 01.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 02.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
SE | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.03.2006 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
DE | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
PT | 22.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
NL | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.03.2006 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 21.12.2005 | |
CH | 21.12.2005 | ||
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 21.12.2005 | |
FI | 21.12.2005 | ||
LI | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 21.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3932603 (HAAS GERHARD J) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [AD]US5370863 (BARNEY MICHAEL C [US], et al) [AD] 1,10 * column W *; | [A]US5690911 (MIRAJKAR YELLOJI RAO K [US], et al) [A] 1* column W *; | [A]US5800803 (MIRAJKAR YELLOJI RAO K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W * | Examination | US5032386 | WO0076470 |