EP1210440 - TAQ DNA POLYMERASES HAVING AN AMINO ACID SUBSTITUTION AT E681 AND HOMOLOGS THEREOF EXHIBITING IMPROVED SALT TOLERANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences Corp. 800 Centennial Avenue P.O. Box 1327 Piscataway, NJ 08855-1327 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Amersham Biosciences Corp. 800 Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 1327 Piscataway, N.J. 08855-1327 / US | ||
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Amersham Pharmacia Biotech Inc 800 Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 1327 Piscataway, N.J. 08855-1327 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Maria P.O. Box 1327, 800 Centennial Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855-1327 / US | 02 /
NELSON, John P.O. Box 1327, 800 Centennial Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855-1327 / US | 03 /
KUMAR, Shiv P.O. Box 1327, 800 Centennial Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855-1327 / US | 04 /
FINN, Patrick, J. P.O. Box 1327, 800 Centennial Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855-1327 / US | 05 /
NAMPALLI, Satyaam P.O. Box 1327, 800 Centennial Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855-1327 / US | 06 /
FLICKE, Parke P.O. Box 1327, 800 Centennial Avenue Piscataway, NJ 08855-1327 / US | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al GE Healtcare Limited, Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2002/23] | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al Amersham plc The Grove Centre White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00955487.4 | 10.08.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000US22150 | Priority number, date | US19990150167P | 21.08.1999 Original published format: US 150167 P | US19990154739P | 17.09.1999 Original published format: US 154739 P | [2005/06] |
Former [2004/19] | US19990148012P | 10.08.1999 | |
US19990154739P | 17.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | US19990150167P | 21.08.1999 | |
US19990154739P | 17.09.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0114568 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210440 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1210440 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N15/70, C12N9/12, C12N1/21, C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, // C12N1:21, C12R1:19 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
C12P19/34 (EP);
C12N9/1252 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2535/101, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2521/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAQ DNA-POLYMERASE MIT EINER AMINOSÄURESUBSTITUTION IN POSITION E681 UND ENTSPRECHENDE HOMOLOGE MIT EINER VERBESSERTEN SALZTOLERANZ, NÜTZLICH FÜR DIE SEQUENZIERUNG SCHWIERIGER TEMPLATESEQUENZEN MITTELS GELADENEN ODER UNGELADENEN TERMINATOREN | [2002/23] | English: | TAQ DNA POLYMERASES HAVING AN AMINO ACID SUBSTITUTION AT E681 AND HOMOLOGS THEREOF EXHIBITING IMPROVED SALT TOLERANCE | [2002/23] | French: | ADN POLYMERASES TAQ AVEC SUBSTITUTION D'ACIDE AMINE EN E681 ET LEURS HOMOLOGUES PRESENTANT UNE TOLERANCE ACCRUE AU SEL | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2005 | BE | 20.07.2005 | CH | 20.07.2005 | FI | 20.07.2005 | FR | 20.07.2005 | IT | 20.07.2005 | LI | 20.07.2005 | NL | 20.07.2005 | CY | 10.08.2005 | IE | 10.08.2005 | LU | 10.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | DK | 20.10.2005 | GB | 20.10.2005 | GR | 20.10.2005 | SE | 20.10.2005 | ES | 31.10.2005 | PT | 21.12.2005 | DE | 01.03.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IT | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
LU | 10.08.2005 | ||
FR | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IT | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
LU | 10.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
LU | 10.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 10.08.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 20.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 20.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 10.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0655506 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0745676 (AMERSHAM LIFE SCIENCE INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9840496 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [A] * claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP0902035 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] * page 6, line 21 - line 28; tables I,II *; | [A]US5885813 (DAVIS MARIA [US], et al) [A] * the whole document * |