EP1228647 - AN IMPROVED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCED PUPPETRY OR SIMILAR TYPES OF PERFORMANCES UTILIZING A VIRTUAL SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kriegman, Mitchell 59 HOratio Street New York, NY 10014 / US | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Topley, Paul, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Topley, Paul, et al Beresford & Co 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00955655.6 | 17.08.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000US22612 | Priority number, date | US20000187814P | 08.03.2000 Original published format: US 187814 P | US20000537529 | 29.03.2000 Original published format: US 537529 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0167779 | Date: | 13.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228647 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/74, H04N9/75, G03B15/10, H04N5/272 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
H04N9/75 (EP);
G03B15/10 (EP);
H04N5/272 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/32] | H04N9/74, H04N9/75 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR GEKONNTES PUPPENSPIEL ODER ÄHNLICHE ARTEN VON VORFÜHRUNGEN UNTER BENUTZUNG VIRTUELLER MENGEN | [2002/32] | English: | AN IMPROVED METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCED PUPPETRY OR SIMILAR TYPES OF PERFORMANCES UTILIZING A VIRTUAL SET | [2002/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A AMELIORER UNE REPRESENTATION ARTISTIQUE, TELLE QU'UN SPECTACLE DE MARIONNETTES, AU MOYEN D'UN ENSEMBLE VIRTUEL | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 22.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/52] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2003 | 31.08.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5923400 ; | [AP]US6101289 ; | [A]US5949433 ; | [A]US5151793 ; | [A]US6034740 ; | [A]US5790124 ; | [A]US5519826 |