EP1189681 - DEVICE FOR CLEANING FLUE GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Argillon GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 43 96257 Redwitz / DE | [2004/16] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIGLING, Ralf 1902 Kingsley Circle Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2003/49] | Application number, filing date | 00956051.7 | 28.06.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000DE02107 | Priority number, date | DE1999129765 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929765 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100302 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1189681 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189681 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86, B01D53/88 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
B01D53/90 (EP,US);
B01D53/86 (KR);
B01D53/8631 (EP,US);
F23J15/003 (EP,US);
F23J2215/10 (EP,US);
F23J2219/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR RAUCHGAS | [2002/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR CLEANING FLUE GAS | [2002/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DE GAZ DE COMBUSTION | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 23.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.05.2004 | FI | 19.05.2004 | FR | 19.05.2004 | IE | 19.05.2004 | LU | 28.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | DK | 19.08.2004 | GR | 19.08.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | PT | 19.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
FR | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
FR | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
LU | 28.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
SE | 19.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 19.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10151324 ; | [A]DE8619685U (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]DE4309460 (DOLATA TILO DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]DE4435103 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 8 - column 7, line 30; figures 1,6 *; | [A]DE19704608 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 7, line 68 - column 8, line 19; figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10151324 A 19980609 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |