EP1242209 - HARD METAL COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optiweld AB Hälleforsvägen 5E 713 72 Gyttorp / SE | [2005/11] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Mälar Trading AB Ringborregatan 1A 721 34 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Mälar Trading AB Ringboerrgatan 1A 721 34 Västers / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUSTAVSEN, Steinar Kungsgatan 21D S-713 31 Nora / SE | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00957188.6 | 22.08.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000SE01602 | Priority number, date | SE19990003726 | 18.10.1999 Original published format: SE 9903726 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0128729 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242209 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1242209 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/04, B23K35/30, B23K35/32 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
B23K31/025 (EP);
B23K35/327 (EP);
B23K35/3046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARTMETALBESCHICHTUNG | [2002/39] | English: | HARD METAL COATING | [2002/39] | French: | REVETEMENT EN METAL DUR | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2005 | BE | 29.06.2005 | CH | 29.06.2005 | ES | 29.06.2005 | FI | 29.06.2005 | FR | 29.06.2005 | IT | 29.06.2005 | LI | 29.06.2005 | NL | 29.06.2005 | CY | 22.08.2005 | IE | 22.08.2005 | LU | 22.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | DK | 29.09.2005 | GB | 29.09.2005 | GR | 29.09.2005 | DE | 30.09.2005 | PT | 07.12.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
IT | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
CY | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 22.08.2005 | ||
FR | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GB | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
DE | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
IT | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
CY | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GB | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
DE | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
CY | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GB | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
DE | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
CY | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GB | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
DE | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
ES | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GB | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
DE | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
DE | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
DE | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
CH | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
LI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 29.06.2005 | |
BE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 29.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5051112 (KESHAVAN MADAPUSI K [US], et al); | [A]GB2257075 (KURIMOTO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5492186 (OVERSTREET JAMES L [US], et al); | [A]EP0972606 (DURUM VERSCHLEISSSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]) |