EP1272147 - DENTAL MATERIALS WITH EXTENDABLE WORK TIME, KITS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARIM, Naimul P. O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
OXMAN, Joel, D. P. O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
ABUELYAMAN, Ahmed, S. P. O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
GADDAM, Babu N. P. O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00957344.5 | 09.08.2000 | [2003/02] | WO2000US21713 | Priority number, date | US20000541417 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: US 541417 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0174301 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272147 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272147 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
C07C219/08 (EP,US);
A61K6/887 (EP,US);
C07C233/49 (EP,US);
C07C271/16 (EP,US);
Y10S522/908 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/02] | Title | German: | DENTALMATERIALIEN MIT VERLÄNGERTER VERARBEITUNGSZEIT, KITS UND VERFAHREN | [2006/24] | English: | DENTAL MATERIALS WITH EXTENDABLE WORK TIME, KITS, AND METHODS | [2003/02] | French: | PRODUITS DENTAIRES DOTES DE TEMPS DE TRAVAIL EXTENSIBLE, KITS ET PROCEDES | [2003/02] |
Former [2003/02] | DENTALWERKSTOFFE MIT VERLÄNGERTER VERARBEITUNGSZEIT, KITS UND VERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IT | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | IE | 09.08.2006 | LU | 09.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
LU | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0148400 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1,12,25,26,49,54 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 7 * * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4536523 (ANTONUCCI JOSEPH M [US]) [A] 1,7-10 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0176777 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 28 * column 5, line 32 *; | [A]US4774267 (WEINTRAUB YURI [US]) [A] 1,7-10 * column 6, line 27 - line 36 *; | [A]EP0576112 (IVOCLAR AG [LI]); | [XY]WO9940884 (KERR CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13-24,49-52,55 * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 2 * * page 8, line 7 - page 12, line 13 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 22 * * page 15, line 11 - page 16, line 16 * [Y] 1,12,25,26,28,49,54 |