EP1190081 - PLANTS WITH MODIFIED GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAGASSER, Martin Lichtstrasse 23 D-50825 Köln / DE | 02 /
WEISSHAAR, Bernd Fingerhutweg 13 D-50226 Frechen / DE | 03 /
DEKKER, Koen Goldammerweg 9 D-50829 Köln / DE | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr. Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte, Müllerstrasse 1 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00958118.2 | 03.07.2000 | [2002/13] | WO2000DE02233 | Priority number, date | DE1999130570 | 02.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19930570 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0102590 | Date: | 11.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1190081 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190081 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/29, C07K14/415, A01H5/00 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/8234 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLANZEN MIT VERÄNDERTER GENEXPRESSION | [2002/13] | English: | PLANTS WITH MODIFIED GENE EXPRESSION | [2002/13] | French: | PLANTES A EXPRESSION GENIQUE MODIFIEE | [2002/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 19.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.11.2007 | IE | 28.11.2007 | GR | 29.02.2008 | ES | 11.03.2008 | PT | 28.04.2008 | LU | 03.07.2008 | IT | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
LU | 03.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | IE | 28.11.2007 | |
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | IE | 28.11.2007 | |
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | IE | 28.11.2007 | |
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | ES | 11.03.2008 | |
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | ES | 11.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9822604 (PIONEER HI BRED INT) [X] 1-4,7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US5215912 (HOFFMAN LESLIE M) [X] 1-4,9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9914351 (DU PONT ;FADER GARY MICHAEL (US)) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract *; | [X]WO9859056 (APPLIED PHYTOLOGICS INC) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9837201 (SUNDARESAN VENKATESAN ;COLASANTI JOSEPH J (US); COLD SPRING HARBOR) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9900501 (GRAY JOHN CLINTON ;PLANT BIOSCIENCE LTD (GB); WALKER AMANDA RUTH () [A] * the whole document *; | [X] - ROUNSLEY, S.D., ET AL., "a BAC end sequence database for identifying minimal overlaps in Arabidopsis genomic sequencing. update 4 - unpublished", EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, (19980329), XP002162120 [X] 10-12 * accession no. AQ010864 * | [A] - WISMAN ELLEN ET AL, "Knock-out mutants from an En-1 mutagenized Arabidopsis thaliana population generated phenylpropanoid biosynthesis phenotypes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON,US, (19981013), vol. 95, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12432 - 12437, XP002154815 [A] * Table 1, Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.21.12432 | [A] - SHIRLEY B ET AL, "Analysis of Arabidopsis mutants deficient in flavonoid biosynthesis", PLANT JOURNAL,GB,BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, (19951101), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 659 - 671, XP002082377 [A] * Fig. 1 , Table 1; Fig. 2; page 667, right column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1995.08050659.x | [PX] - FEDERSPIEL N.A., ET AL., "unpublished", EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, (19991215), XP002162121 [PX] 10,19-21 * accession no. AC018460 * | Examination | - SAGASSER M ET AL, "A. thaliana TRANSPARENT TESTA 1 is involved in seed coat development and defines the WIP subfamily of plant zinc finger proteins", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2002), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1101/GAD.212702, pages 138 - 149, XP002521044 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GAD.212702 |