EP1203151 - TWO-STAGE ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE FOR AN INJECTOR OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/07] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOECKING, Friedrich Kahlhieb 34 D-70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/19] | Application number, filing date | 00958208.1 | 02.08.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000DE02578 | Priority number, date | DE1999137559 | 09.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19937559 | [2002/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111221 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203151 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203151 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02, F02M45/08 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
F02M63/0056 (EP,US);
F02M45/08 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M63/0022 (EP,US);
F02M63/0036 (EP,US);
F02M63/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGES MAGNETVENTIL FÜR EINEN INJEKTOR VON BRENNKARFTMASCHINEN | [2002/19] | English: | TWO-STAGE ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE FOR AN INJECTOR OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [2002/19] | French: | ELECTROVANNE BIETAGEE DESTINEE A UN INJECTEUR D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IE | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | AT | 02.08.2008 | GB | 02.08.2008 | LU | 02.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
AT | 02.08.2008 | ||
GB | 02.08.2008 | ||
LU | 02.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
AT | 02.08.2008 | ||
GB | 02.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
AT | 02.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 13.02.2008 | |
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IE | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 24.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0829641 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,8,9 * column 6, line 41 - column 12, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE19708104 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * column 1, line 59 - column 4, line 58; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]DE19741850 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,5,6,8,9* column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 8; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0907018 (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0916843 (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 9; figures 1-3 * |