EP1214325 - MODULATORS OF PROTEIN TYROSINE PHOSPHATASES (PTPases) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | For all designated states Ontogen Corporation 6451 El Camino Real Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
For all designated states Ontogen Corporation 6451 El Camino Real Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Henrik, Sune Gustav Adolphsvej 2 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | 02 /
HANSEN, Thomas, Kruse Tibbevangen 78 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | 03 /
LAU, Jesper Dybedalsvej 27 DK-3520 Farum / DK | 04 /
MO̸LLER, Niels, Peter, Hundahl Midtermolen 4, 3. DK-2100 Copenhagen O̸ / DK | 05 /
OLSEN, Ole, Hvilsted Bækkeskovvej 38 DK-2700 Bro̸nsho̸j / DK | 06 /
AXE, Frank, Urban 1250 Birch Avenue Escondido, CA 92027 / US | 07 /
GE, Yu 12455 Brickella Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 08 /
HOLSWORTH, Daniel, Dale 9462 Chabola Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 09 /
JONES, Todd, Kevin 546 Marview Drive Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 10 /
JUDGE, Luke, Milburn 644 Bonair Way La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 11 /
RIPKA, Wiliam, Charles 10819 Red Rock Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 12 /
SHAPIRA, Barry, Zvi 5925 La Jolla Corona Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 13 /
UYEDA, Roy, Teruyuki 5385 Toscana Way, Apt. 342 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2005/45] |
Former [2002/25] | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Henrik, Sune Gustav Adolphsvej 2 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | ||
02 /
HANSEN, Thomas, Kruse Tibbevangen 78 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | |||
03 /
LAU, Jesper Dybedalsvej 27 DK-3520 Farum / DK | |||
04 /
M LLER, Niels, Peter, Hundahl Midtermolen 4, 3. DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | |||
05 /
OLSEN, Ole, Hvilsted B kkeskovvej 38 DK-2700 Br nsh j / DK | |||
06 /
AXE, Frank, Urban 1250 Birch Avenue Escondido, CA 92027 / US | |||
07 /
GE, Yu 12455 Brickella Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
08 /
HOLSWORTH, Daniel, Dale 9462 Chabola Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
09 /
JONES, Todd, Kevin 546 Marview Drive Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | |||
10 /
JUDGE, Luke, Milburn 644 Bonair Way La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
11 /
RIPKA, Wiliam, Charles 10819 Red Rock Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | |||
12 /
SHAPIRA, Barry, Zvi 5925 La Jolla Corona Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | |||
13 /
UYEDA, Roy, Teruyuki 5385 Toscana Way, Apt. 342 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard (DK) c/o Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 00958277.6 | 11.09.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000DK00503 | Priority number, date | DK19990001278 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: DK 127899 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0119831 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214325 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214325 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, C07D513/04, C07D493/04, A61K31/381, A61K31/395, A61P3/00, A61P5/00, A61P7/00, A61P17/00, A61P19/00, A61P25/00, A61P31/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/02 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/45] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULATOREN DER PROTEIN TYROSIN PHOSPHATASE (PTPASES) | [2002/25] | English: | MODULATORS OF PROTEIN TYROSINE PHOSPHATASES (PTPases) | [2002/25] | French: | MODULATEURS DE PROTEINES TYROSINE PHOSPHATAGES (PTPases) | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 26.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Request for further processing for: | 18.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 18.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2004 | Decision despatched | 22.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.08.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.2005 | BE | 09.11.2005 | CH | 09.11.2005 | CY | 09.11.2005 | FI | 09.11.2005 | FR | 09.11.2005 | IT | 09.11.2005 | LI | 09.11.2005 | NL | 09.11.2005 | DK | 09.02.2006 | GR | 09.02.2006 | SE | 09.02.2006 | DE | 10.02.2006 | ES | 20.02.2006 | PT | 10.04.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
IT | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
DE | 10.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
DE | 10.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CH | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
LI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3953468 (WECHTER WILLIAM J, et al) [A] 1-99; | [A]GB1583679 (BRISTOL MYERS CO)[A] 1-99; | [PX]WO9946267 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-99; | [PX]WO9946237 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-99; | [PX]WO9946268 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-99; | [PX] XP002901472 [PX] 1-99 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.14.10300 | [PX] XP002901473 [PX] 1-99 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M910273199 |